WA HB1108 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Maintaining funding and assistance for homeowners navigating the foreclosure process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maintaining funding and assistance for homeowners navigating the foreclosure process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-01-29HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-01-29HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-01-29HouseFloor amendment
2021-01-29House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-01-26HousePlaced on second reading.
2021-01-22HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-01-07HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6124166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6124173Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1108&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1108.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1108-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1108-S.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1108-S%20AMH%20WALJ%20H0633.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1108%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1108%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1108-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123228&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28319&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123228&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-29-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1108&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback