WA HB1105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting taxpayers from home foreclosure.
Title
Protecting taxpayers from home foreclosure.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Effective date 1/1/2020. |
2019-05-09 | House | Chapter 332, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-09 | House | Held on second reading. |
2019-03-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | Work session and public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |