WA HB1098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor & Workplace Standards Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unemployment insurance.
Title
Concerning unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Alicia Rule [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5061 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Effective date 2/8/2021.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 50 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 04 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 16 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 1201 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 1202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 24 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 025 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 44 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 60 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 60 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1098&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1098.pdf |