WA HB1095 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on February 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Effective date 2/19/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the taxation of governmental financial assistance programs addressing the impacts of conditions giving rise to a gubernatorial or presidential emergency proclamation by creating state business and occupation tax and state public utility tax exemptions, a sales and use tax exemption for the receipt of such financial assistance, and clarifying the sales and use tax obligations for goods and services purchased by recipients of such financial assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the taxation of governmental financial assistance programs addressing the impacts of conditions giving rise to a gubernatorial or presidential emergency proclamation by creating state business and occupation tax and state public utility tax exemptions, a sales and use tax exemption for the receipt of such financial assistance, and clarifying the sales and use tax obligations for goods and services purchased by recipients of such financial assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseEffective date 2/19/2021.
2021-02-19HouseChapter 4, 2021 Laws.
2021-02-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-02-17HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-02-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-02-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-02-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-04SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-02-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-22HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-01-22HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-01-22House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-01-21HousePlaced on second reading.
2021-01-19HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2021-01-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8204New CodeSee Bill Text
8204050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8208New CodeSee Bill Text
8216New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1095&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1095.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1095-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1095-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1095-S.SL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1095%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1095%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1095-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1095-S%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1095-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1095-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1095-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1095-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123193&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28274&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123193&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-22-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1095&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123193&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28431&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123193&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1095&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback