WA HB1095 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning antifreeze products.
Title
Concerning antifreeze products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 198, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 3:15 PM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-25 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |