WA HB1093 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning unmanned aircraft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning unmanned aircraft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-24SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Rules.
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-04-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-03-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2015-03-31SenateMinority; do not pass.
2015-03-31SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2015-03-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2015-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
2015-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2015-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2015-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-03-04HouseFloor amendment
2015-03-04House1st substitute bill substituted
2015-02-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-02-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-01-29HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2015-01-29HouseTED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2015-01-29HouseTED - Executive action taken by committee.
2015-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM.
2015-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development
2015-01-09HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback