WA HB1092 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning law enforcement data collection.
Title
Concerning law enforcement data collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-04 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-19 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5259 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Subjects
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
DEATH
ENTERPRISE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT
LAW ENFORCEMENT AND LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL
DEATH
ENTERPRISE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT
LAW ENFORCEMENT AND LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL