WA HB1091 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical corrections and removing obsolete language from the Revised Code of Washington pursuant to RCW 1.08.025.
Title
Making technical corrections and removing obsolete language from the Revised Code of Washington pursuant to RCW 1.08.025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 64, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-25 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |