WA HB1089 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning compliance audits of requirements relating to peace officers and law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning compliance audits of requirements relating to peace officers and law enforcement agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-12HousePassed final passage; yeas, 69; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-07SenateFloor amendment
2021-04-07SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-25SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-12SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-11SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-11SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-11SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM.
2021-02-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-02-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-10HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-10House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-09HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-04HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-04HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-04HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-19HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-19HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-01-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5069 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-11 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43101New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1089&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1089.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1089-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1089-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1089-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1089-S2.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1089-S2%20AMH%20RAMO%20PATT%20020.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1089-S2.E%20AMS%20LAW%20S1955.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1089-S2.E%20AMS%20DHIN%20S2393.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1089-S2.E%20AMS%20PADD%20S2673.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1089-S2.E%20AMS%20PADD%20S2674.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1089-S2.E%20AMS%20ENGR%20S2393.E.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1089%20HBA%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1089%20HBR%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1089%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1089-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1089-S2.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1089-S2.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1089-S2.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123162&actionText=PS%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28261&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123162&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28485&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123162&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1089&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123162&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28717&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123162&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Law%20%26amp%3B%20Justice.&mId=28895&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123162&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1089&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123162&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1089&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback