WA HB1089 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the schedule for updates to the comprehensive plan of Kitsap county.
Title
Amending the schedule for updates to the comprehensive plan of Kitsap county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |