WA HB1089 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Capital Budget.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Capital Budget.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the 2013-2015 capital budget.
Title
Adopting the 2013-2015 capital budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-06-29 | House | Returned to House Rules. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2013-06-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-06-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | Returned to House Rules. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-12 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-12 | House | CB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5035 (Crossfiled) 2013-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2013.