WA HB1087 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning automated traffic safety cameras in school speed zones.
Title
Concerning automated traffic safety cameras in school speed zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-26 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |