WA HB1086 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing appropriated funding for public defense services.
Title
Increasing appropriated funding for public defense services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-25 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5098 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1086&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1086.pdf |