WA HB1085 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating the minimum dimensions of habitable spaces in single-family residential areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating the minimum dimensions of habitable spaces in single-family residential areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-28HouseChapter 302, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-28HouseGovernor partially vetoed.
2018-03-06HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-02-16SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-15SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-15SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2018-01-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-01-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-16HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-01HouseCDHT - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback