WA HB1084 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unfair practices involving compensation of athletes in higher education.
Title
Concerning unfair practices involving compensation of athletes in higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by College & Workforce Development. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-04 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5875 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.