WA HB1083 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning relocation assistance for tenants of closed or converted manufactured/mobile home parks.
Title
Concerning relocation assistance for tenants of closed or converted manufactured/mobile home parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-14 | House | Chapter 28, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-26 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 21 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 21 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |