WA HB1082 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning state oversight and accountability of peace officers and corrections officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning state oversight and accountability of peace officers and corrections officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-01-05HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5051 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3412035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4014070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101096Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101106Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101116Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101136Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101146Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101156Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101180Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43101230Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101390Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101400Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback