WA HB1080 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing impact fees to be used for all fire protection facilities.
Title
Allowing impact fees to be used for all fire protection facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 86, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-19 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-18 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-02 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2009-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |