WA HB1074 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements governing and associated with plat approvals.
Title
Concerning requirements governing and associated with plat approvals.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-18 | House | Chapter 16, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 0. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-01-24 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-01-24 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-01-24 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5609 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.