WA HB1072 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing only one of the restrictions on the use of civil legal aid funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing only one of the restrictions on the use of civil legal aid funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-11SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-11SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM.
2021-02-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-12HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-02-12HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-02-12HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2021-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-15HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
253030Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1072&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1072.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1072%20AMH%20WALJ%20BAKY%20161.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1072%20AMH%20WALJ%20BAKY%20162.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1072%20AMH%20WALJ%20BAKY%20163.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1072%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1072%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1072%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1072%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1072%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1072%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1072%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1072%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1072%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123133&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28404&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123133&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1072&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123133&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28220&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123133&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28717&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123133&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1072&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback