WA HB1072 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing the prevailing wage laws to ensure contractor and owner accountability and worker protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing the prevailing wage laws to ensure contractor and owner accountability and worker protection.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-01-02HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5035 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback