WA HB1071 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing an expiration date for legislation enacted in 2015 regarding pawnbroker fees and interest rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing an expiration date for legislation enacted in 2015 regarding pawnbroker fees and interest rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-19HouseChapter 51, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-19HouseGovernor signed.
2017-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-12SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
2017-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-16SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-14SenateFI - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-14SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.
2017-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-01-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-01-18HouseBFS - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:30 AM.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services
2017-01-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5157 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback