WA HB1071 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a complete streets grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a complete streets grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-05 Effective date 7/22/2011.
2011-05-05 Chapter 257, 2011 Laws.
2011-05-05 Governor signed.
2011-04-19 Delivered to Governor.
2011-04-18 President signed.
2011-04-18 Speaker signed.
2011-04-13 Passed final passage; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2011-04-13 House concurred in Senate amendments.
2011-04-04 Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2011-04-04 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-04-04 Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
2011-03-31 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-03-29 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-03-28 Minority; do not pass.
2011-03-28 TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2011-03-28 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2011-03-09 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-03-02 First reading, referred to Transportation.
2011-02-28 Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2011-02-28 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-02-28 Floor amendment
2011-02-28 1st substitute bill substituted
2011-02-15 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-02-03 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-01-27 Minority; do not pass.
2011-01-27 TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-01-27 TR - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-01-27 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-01-17 Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-01-10 First reading, referred to Transportation.
2011-01-05 Prefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback