WA HB1071 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning advanced registered nurse practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning advanced registered nurse practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-25 Effective date 7/26/2009.
2009-04-25 Chapter 217, 2009 Laws.
2009-04-25 Governor signed.
2009-04-20 Delivered to Governor.
2009-04-19 President signed.
2009-04-18 Speaker signed.
2009-04-16 Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2009-04-16 House concurred in Senate amendments.
2009-04-07 Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2009-04-07 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-04-07 Committee amendment adopted as amended.
2009-03-31 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2009-03-26 Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
2009-03-20 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-03-20 HEA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2009-03-19 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2009-03-16 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2009-02-16 First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care.
2009-02-13 Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2009-02-13 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-02-13 1st substitute bill substituted
2009-02-09 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2009-02-03 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-01-30 HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2009-01-30 HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
2009-01-30 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2009-01-22 Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2009-01-12 First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2009-01-06 Prefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback