WA HB1070 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying allowed uses of local tax revenue for affordable housing and related services to include the acquisition and construction of affordable housing and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying allowed uses of local tax revenue for affordable housing and related services to include the acquisition and construction of affordable housing and facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseEffective date 4/14/2021.
2021-04-14HouseChapter 27, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-05SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-03-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-30SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-16SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-16SenateHLG - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-25House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2021-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6728180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214530Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1070&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1070.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1070-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1070-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1070-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1070-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1070-S%20AMH%20ORWA%20H0823.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1070-S%20AMH%20RYUC%20H0813.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1070-S%20AMH%20ESLI%20H1123.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1070-S.E%20AMS%20SHOR%20S2214.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1070%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1070%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1070-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1070-S.E%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1070-S.E%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1070-S.E%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1070-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1070-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123131&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28364&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123131&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1070&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123131&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28859&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123131&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-30-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1070&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback