WA HB1070 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning veteran lottery games.
Title
Concerning veteran lottery games.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-18 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |