WA HB1068 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting election security information from public records disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting election security information from public records disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseEffective date 4/14/2021.
2021-04-14HouseChapter 26, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-05SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-03-29SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-12SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-26SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-02-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-24House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-21HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-21HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2021-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4256420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1068&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1068.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1068-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1068-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1068-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1068-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1068-S%20AMH%20WALJ%20OLER%20011.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1068-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20OLER%20012.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1068-S%20AMH%20SUTH%20OLER%20015.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1068%20HBA%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1068%20HBR%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1068-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1068-S.E%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1068-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1068-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1068-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1068-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1068-S.E%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123129&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28235&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123129&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1068&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123129&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28732&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123129&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-29-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1068&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback