WA HB1068 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the Washington business corporation act.
Title
Revising the Washington business corporation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-23 | Chapter 189, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-17 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-13 | President signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-01-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-15 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-15 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-01-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction. |