WA HB1065 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the insurer holding company act.
Title
Amending the insurer holding company act.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Business & Financial Services. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-06 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-06 | House | GGIT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred to Gen Govt & Info Tech. |
2015-01-14 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-14 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5717 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/1/2017*.