WA HB1063 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 4/16/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 4/16/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing additional renewals for behavioral health professional trainee and associate credentials.
Title
Allowing additional renewals for behavioral health professional trainee and associate credentials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 4/16/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 57, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-12-31 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 205 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 225 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |