WA HB1063 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing federally recognized tribes with lands held in trust in a county that is west of the Cascade mountain range that borders Puget Sound with a population of at least one hundred eighteen thousand, but less than two hundred fifty thousand, persons to enter into agreements regarding fuel taxes.
Title
Allowing federally recognized tribes with lands held in trust in a county that is west of the Cascade mountain range that borders Puget Sound with a population of at least one hundred eighteen thousand, but less than two hundred fifty thousand, persons to enter into agreements regarding fuel taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. David Sawyer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | TR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |