WA HB1058 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying the sales and use tax for cultural access programs by allowing the tax to be imposed by a councilmanic or commission authority and defining timelines and priorities for action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the sales and use tax for cultural access programs by allowing the tax to be imposed by a councilmanic or commission authority and defining timelines and priorities for action.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2021-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2020-12-29HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214525Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback