WA HB1058 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing provisions relating to court-ordered restitution in certain criminal cases.
Title
Changing provisions relating to court-ordered restitution in certain criminal cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-21 | House | Chapter 123, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2017-04-17 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-26 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |