WA HB1056 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consumer protections for military service members on active duty.
Title
Concerning consumer protections for military service members on active duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 197, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-19 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5041 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.