WA HB1054 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing requirements for tactics and equipment used by peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing requirements for tactics and equipment used by peace officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2020-12-24HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10New CodeSee Bill Text
1031040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101New CodeSee Bill Text
43101225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43101226Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback