WA HB1053 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing raffle ticket prices. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning raffle ticket prices. )
Title
Increasing raffle ticket prices. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning raffle ticket prices. )
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
Rep. Brendan Williams [D] | Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-21 | Chapter 133, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-20 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-14 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | President signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Floor amendment | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-20 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-20 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2009-12-30 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5124 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.