WA HB1051 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning financing essential public infrastructure.
Title
Concerning financing essential public infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2016-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1051&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1051.pdf |