WA HB1050 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing greenhouse gas emissions from fluorinated gases.
Title
Reducing greenhouse gas emissions from fluorinated gases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-05-17 | House | Chapter 315, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-02-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-23 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
AIR QUALITY AND POLLUTION
APPLIANCES
BUILDING CODE COUNCIL
CLIMATE
ECOLOGY, DEPARTMENT
ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH AND SAFETY
HAZARDOUS MATERIALS
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STATE AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS
APPLIANCES
BUILDING CODE COUNCIL
CLIMATE
ECOLOGY, DEPARTMENT
ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH AND SAFETY
HAZARDOUS MATERIALS
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STATE AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 27 | 580 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 27a | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 285 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 26 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 15 | 3150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 15 | 3160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 15 | 6410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 15 | 6420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 15 | 6430 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 45 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 45 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |