WA HB1048 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the removal of specific religious references regarding the criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults from a statute.
Title
Concerning the removal of specific religious references regarding the criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults from a statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-21 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 44 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 42 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |