WA HB1045 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing licensing and enforcement provisions applicable to money transmitters and currency exchanges under the uniform money services act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing licensing and enforcement provisions applicable to money transmitters and currency exchanges under the uniform money services act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-02-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.
2017-02-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-02-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-09House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-01-11HouseBFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-01-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services
2016-12-15HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5031 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback