WA HB1044 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the funding of homeownership projects through the housing trust fund.
Title
Concerning the funding of homeownership projects through the housing trust fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1044&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1044.pdf |