WA HB1044 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning health plan coverage for the voluntary termination of a pregnancy.
Title
Concerning health plan coverage for the voluntary termination of a pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2013-02-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2013-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5009 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
SB5798 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
SB5798 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.