WA HB1042 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the international application of the uniform child custody jurisdiction and enforcement act to protect families from facing the death penalty in certain foreign jurisdictions on the basis of religious beliefs, political beliefs, or sexual orientation.
Title
Revising the international application of the uniform child custody jurisdiction and enforcement act to protect families from facing the death penalty in certain foreign jurisdictions on the basis of religious beliefs, political beliefs, or sexual orientation.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Effective date 4/14/2021. |
2021-04-14 | House | Chapter 23, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-01-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-01-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-01-19 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-15 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |