WA HB1041 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning sunshine committee recommendations regarding juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning sunshine committee recommendations regarding juveniles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2022-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2022-02-18SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2022-02-18SenateSGE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2022-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2022-02-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2022-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2022-01-21HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2022-01-17HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2022-01-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2021-04-25HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-24SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-05SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-02House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-28HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2020-12-22HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1097130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1350050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4256230Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4256240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
769a020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
769a030Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1041&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1041.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1041-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1041-S.E.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1041-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20136.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1041-S%20AMH%20SPRI%20ZOLL%20126.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1041-S.E%20AMS%20SGE%20S4715.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1041%20HBA%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1041%20HBR%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1041-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1041-S.E%20SBA%20SGE%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1041-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1041-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1041-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1041-S.E%20SBA%20SGE%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1041-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2022.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1041-S.E%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2022.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123075&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28330&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123075&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1041&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123075&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28896&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123075&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-21-2022&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1041&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123075&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=29807&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback