WA HB1041 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting successful reentry by modifying the process for obtaining certificates of discharge and vacating conviction records.
Title
Promoting successful reentry by modifying the process for obtaining certificates of discharge and vacating conviction records.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | House | Chapter 331, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |