WA HB1040 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM
Pending: House Housing, Community Development & Veterans Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 10:00 am in House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a work group to study and make recommendations on natural disaster mitigation and resiliency activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the creation of a work group to study and make recommendations on natural disaster mitigation and resiliency activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM
2019-01-22HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM
2019-01-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.
2018-12-10HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5106 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-17 - Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback