WA HB1033 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning relocation assistance for manufactured/mobile home park tenants.
Title
Concerning relocation assistance for manufactured/mobile home park tenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-13 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5183 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.