WA HB1030 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the replacement of Interstate 405 express toll lanes with a general purpose lane and a high occupancy vehicle lane.
Title
Authorizing the replacement of Interstate 405 express toll lanes with a general purpose lane and a high occupancy vehicle lane.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2016-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5707 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1030&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1030.pdf |