WA HB1028 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 5/5/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning evaluation and recommendation of candidates for residency teacher certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning evaluation and recommendation of candidates for residency teacher certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseEffective date 5/5/2021.
2021-05-10HouseChapter 198, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-05HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-22SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-21HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-20SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-20SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2021-04-15HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateFloor amendment
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-19SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-19SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-17SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2021-02-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-16HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-28HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-12-16HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a410New CodeSee Bill Text
28a4102211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a410270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28a410280Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1028&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1028.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1028-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1028-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1028-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1028-S2.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1028-S2%20AMS%20MULL%20S2205.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028-S2%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1028-S2%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1028-S2%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1028-S2%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1028-S2%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028-S2%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028-S2%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1028-S2%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123051&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28381&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123051&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28617&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123051&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1028&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123051&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28830&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123051&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1028&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123051&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-20-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1028&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback