WA HB1028 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the types of off-road vehicles subject to local government regulation.
Title
Modifying the types of off-road vehicles subject to local government regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at time TBA. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-23 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |